EP1550312 - AIRCRAFT COMMUNICATION DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rogerson, Michael 2201 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92606 / US | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03762190.1 | 26.06.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003US20441 | Priority number, date | US20020392000P | 26.06.2002 Original published format: US 392000 P | US20020194429 | 11.07.2002 Original published format: US 194429 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004003696 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1550312 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
B64D11/0015 (EP,US);
H04N21/2146 (EP,US);
H04N21/41422 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/42] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGKOMMUNIKATIONSVERTEILERSYSTEM | [2005/27] | English: | AIRCRAFT COMMUNICATION DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [2005/27] | French: | SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION DE COMMUNICATION DANS UN AVION | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 01.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US6529706 (MITCHELL JAMES P [US]); | [A]US5848367 (LOTOCKY DANIEL A [US], et al); | [A]US2001036822 (MEAD STEPHEN E [US], et al) |