EP1525702 - IMPROVED FEEDBACK FOR DATA TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/17] | CONTROL OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RETRANSMISSIONS | ||
[2009/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm, Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDBY, Stein A. 716 North Granados Ave Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03763323.7 | 08.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003US21276 | Priority number, date | US20020191730 | 08.07.2002 Original published format: US 191730 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004006491 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525702 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525702 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L1/00 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
H04L1/0018 (EP,US);
H04L1/18 (KR);
G08C25/02 (KR);
H04L1/00 (KR);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/1829 (EP,US);
H04L1/1858 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR RÜCKQUITTIERUNG VON SENDEWIEDERHOLUNGEN | [2005/17] | English: | IMPROVED FEEDBACK FOR DATA TRANSMISSIONS | [2009/30] | French: | RETOUR AMELIORE POUR TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES | [2005/17] |
Former [2005/17] | CONTROL OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RETRANSMISSIONS | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.2009 | BE | 16.12.2009 | CY | 16.12.2009 | CZ | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | IT | 16.12.2009 | NL | 16.12.2009 | RO | 16.12.2009 | SE | 16.12.2009 | SI | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | TR | 16.12.2009 | BG | 16.03.2010 | GR | 17.03.2010 | ES | 27.03.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | HU | 17.06.2010 | IE | 08.07.2010 | LU | 08.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
IE | 08.07.2010 | ||
LU | 08.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
IE | 08.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
IE | 08.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SE | 16.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0964534 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO0013364 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 4 *; | [A]WO0033503 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 7 *; | [A]WO0052873 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 8, line 26 - line 31 * |