12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
15.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
04.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
27.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
07.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
29.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] |
13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
06.04.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
02.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
01.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
10.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
03.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
14.04.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
24.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.12.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.09.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
24.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
01.07.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
25.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|