EP1562660 - ADMINISTRATION DEVICE COMPRISING AN ADJUSTABLE DOSAGE STOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TecPharma Licensing AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [2005/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAF, Roney Heimiswilstrasse 30 CH-3400 Burgdorf / CH | 02 /
KIRCHHOFER, Fritz Wassermatt CH-3454 Sumiswald / CH | [2005/33] | Application number, filing date | 03763564.6 | 08.07.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003CH00458 | Priority number, date | DE2002132411 | 17.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10232411 | [2005/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004007001 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1562660 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562660 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
A61M5/3158 (EP,US);
A61M5/31551 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3123 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3125 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3126 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/3146 (EP,US);
A61M5/31536 (EP,US);
A61M5/31541 (EP,US);
A61M5/31558 (EP,US);
A61M5/31561 (EP,US);
A61M5/31563 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERABREICHUNGSGERÄT MIT VERSTELLBAREM DOSIERANSCHLAG | [2005/33] | English: | ADMINISTRATION DEVICE COMPRISING AN ADJUSTABLE DOSAGE STOP | [2005/33] | French: | APPAREIL D'ADMINISTRATION A BUTEE DE DOSAGE REGLABLE | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 10.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 09.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.06.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | 10.06.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.06.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   10.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.05.2006 | CZ | 31.05.2006 | EE | 31.05.2006 | FI | 31.05.2006 | IE | 31.05.2006 | NL | 31.05.2006 | RO | 31.05.2006 | SI | 31.05.2006 | SK | 31.05.2006 | TR | 31.05.2006 | LU | 08.07.2006 | BE | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | BG | 31.08.2006 | DK | 31.08.2006 | SE | 31.08.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | ES | 11.09.2006 | PT | 31.10.2006 | HU | 01.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
EE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
TR | 31.05.2006 | ||
LU | 08.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
HU | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
EE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
HU | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
EE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
EE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
RO | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SK | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 31.08.2006 | |
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 31.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5304152 (SAMS BERNARD [GB]); | [A]US6221046 (BURROUGHS ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * figures 1-12 *; | [AD]US6228067 (GABRIEL JOCHEN [DE]) [AD] 1-17 * figures 1-4,15-21 *; | [A]US6241709 (BECHTOLD HERBERT [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO9736625 | DE19900792 | US6228067 |