EP1540229 - CLAMPING RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements CAILLAU 28, rue Ernest Renan 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2008/19] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Etablissements CAILLAU 28, rue Ernest Renan 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENE, Richard La Rue F-41320 Maray / FR | 02 /
GOUSSAULT, Didier 33 B Rue des Limousins F-41200 Romorantin / FR | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03763953.1 | 10.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003FR02162 | Priority number, date | FR20020008884 | 15.07.2002 Original published format: FR 0208884 | [2005/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004008015 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540229 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540229 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/08 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
F01N13/1805 (EP,US);
F16L23/08 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T24/1441 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49428 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49947 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/44] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEMMRING | [2005/24] | English: | CLAMPING RING | [2005/24] | French: | COLLIER DE SERRAGE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0305232 (CAILLAU ETS [FR]) [AD] 1-3 * figure - *; | [AD]WO9843010 (CAILLAU ETS [FR], et al) [AD] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]US2270375 (KING JAMES T) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,5,6 * | by applicant | EP0305232 | WO9843010 |