EP1542046 - OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTION COMPONENT, OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTION STRUCTURE, AND OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO. LTD. 5-15 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8335 / JP | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO. LTD. 5-15 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8335 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Kyoichi, c/o Technical Res. Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | 02 /
Kawase, Ritsu, c/o Technical Res. Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Masayoshi, c/o Technical Res. Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Tatsushi, c/o Technical Res. Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03764188.3 | 14.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003JP08915 | Priority number, date | JP20020205328 | 15.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002205328 | [2005/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004008213 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542046 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542046 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G02B6/3869 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/3839 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/255 (KR);
G02B6/3806 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/3878 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/3882 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/44] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHE VERBINDUNGSKOMPONENTE,FASEROPTISCHE VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR UND FASEROPTISCHES VERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/24] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTION COMPONENT, OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTION STRUCTURE, AND OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTION METHOD | [2005/24] | French: | COMPOSANT DE CONNEXION DE FIBRES OPTIQUES, STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION DE FIBRES OPTIQUES ET PROCEDE DE CONNEXION DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2005 | Translation filed | 28.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 16.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH1114862 ; | [A]JPS56114914 ; | [A]JPH10170759 ; | [A]US4166672 (GILBERT ALAN R [GB]) [A] 1-10 * column 10, line 50 - column 2, line 7; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5757996 (VINE RAYMOND GEORGE [GB]) [Y] 4 * column W *; | [A]US5920670 (LEE NICHOLAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column W * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11014862 A 19990122 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD; NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811205), vol. 005, no. 191, Database accession no. (P - 092), & JP56114914 A 19810909 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10170759 A 19980626 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0485305U ; | [X]JPH10170759 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [Y]US5838856 (LEE HO-KYUNG [KR]); | [X]JPH1114862 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al); | [X]JP2972584B ; | [X]JP2000292652 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]EP1118892 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) |