EP1539778 - DEPROTECTION AND PURIFICATION OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND THEIR DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sirna Therapeutics, Inc. 2950 Wilderness Place Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARGEESE, Chandra 14010 Westhampton Place Broomfield, CO 80020 / US | 02 /
SHAFFER, Christopher 9141 Ute Highway Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 03 /
BOWMAN, Keith 2633 Danbury Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Rollins, Anthony John, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Rollins, Anthony John, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2008/22] | Rollins, Anthony John, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road Hoddesdon Herts EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Maschio, Antonio, Dr. D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03764537.1 | 14.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US21775 | Priority number, date | US20020194875 | 12.07.2002 Original published format: US 194875 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004007748 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539778 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/02, C07H21/02 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C12N15/101 (EP,US);
C07H21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTSCHüTZEN UND AUFREINIGUNG VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN UND DEREN DERIVATEN | [2005/24] | English: | DEPROTECTION AND PURIFICATION OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND THEIR DERIVATIVES | [2005/24] | French: | DEPROTECTION ET PURIFICATION D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES ET DE LEURS DERIVES | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/14] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - WINCOTT, F. ET AL., "Synthesis, deprotection, analysis and purification of RNA and ribozymes", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 23, no. 14, pages 2677 - 2684, XP002617037 [I] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/23.14.2677 | [A] - REDDY ET AL, "Methylamine deprotection provides increased yield of oligoribonucleotides", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19951204), vol. 36, no. 49, doi:10.1016/0040-4039(95)01953-F, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 8929 - 8932, XP005250026 [A] 1-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)01953-F | [A] - "SYNTHESIS AND PURIFICATION OF MILLIGRAM QUANTITIES OF SHORT RNA TRANSCRIPTS", BIOTECHNIQUES, INFORMA LIFE SCIENCES PUBLISHING, WESTBOROUGH, MA, US, (19950601), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 992 - 994, XP008067112 [A] 1-25 | International search | [Y]US5552539 (DUPLAA ANNE-MARIE [FR], et al); | [A] - "Nucleic acid analogues: Synthesis and properties", HUNZIKER J. AND LEUMANN C., BERN, INSTITUT FOR ORGANISCHE CHEMIE, UNIVERSITAET BERN, pages 331 - 417, XP002975766 |