EP1522100 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2005/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEHRER, Daniel Hacklweg 9 A-4081 Hartkirchen / AT | 02 /
KNAPP, Herbert Keuslinstr. 10 80798 München / DE | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03764888.8 | 11.07.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003DE02349 | Priority number, date | DE2002131638 | 12.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10231638 | [2005/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004010501 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522100 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/66 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
H03F3/45183 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45562 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45638 (EP,US);
H03H7/0115 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/15] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG | [2005/15] | English: | INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT | [2005/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE CIRCUIT INTEGRE | [2005/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 23.08.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH04107940 ; | [X]EP0574180 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 21; figure 2 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 30 *; | [X]WO0051012 (FORMFACTOR INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 12, line 27 - page 16, line 30; figures 7-9,15 * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 32; figures 4,5 * * page 19, line 22 - page 21, line 13 * * page 26, line 1 - line 6 *; | [A]US6323735 (WELLAND DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 16, line 4 - column 17, line 30; figures 7A,7B * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920727), vol. 016, no. 347, Database accession no. (E - 1240), & JP04107940 A 19920409 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-10 |