EP1527057 - METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF PROPYLENE GLYCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASSLER, Peter Maria-Mandel-Strasse 18 68519 Viernheim / DE | 02 /
GÖBBEL, Hans-Geeorg Im Mosenborn 33 67169 Kallstadt / DE | 03 /
TELES, Joaquim, Henrique Reiherstrasse 29 a 67166 Otterstadt / DE | 04 /
RUDOLF, Peter Rautenthalermühle 12 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03765087.6 | 22.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003EP07988 | Priority number, date | DE20021033385 | 23.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10233385 | [2005/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004009568 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1527057 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1527057 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D301/12, C07C29/10, C07C31/20, B01D3/40 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
B01D3/141 (EP,US);
B01D3/143 (EP,US);
C07C29/106 (EP,US);
C07D301/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/106, C07C31/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON PROPYLENGLYKOLEN | [2005/18] | English: | METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF PROPYLENE GLYCOL | [2005/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CONTINUE DE PROPYLENE GLYCOLS | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 29.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.11.2007 | CZ | 21.11.2007 | DK | 21.11.2007 | EE | 21.11.2007 | FI | 21.11.2007 | GB | 21.11.2007 | IE | 21.11.2007 | RO | 21.11.2007 | SI | 21.11.2007 | SK | 21.11.2007 | TR | 21.11.2007 | BG | 21.02.2008 | SE | 21.02.2008 | GR | 22.02.2008 | ES | 04.03.2008 | PT | 21.04.2008 | HU | 22.05.2008 | AT | 22.07.2008 | LU | 22.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 21.11.2007 | |
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
HU | 22.05.2008 | ||
AT | 22.07.2008 | ||
LU | 22.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 21.11.2007 | |
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
AT | 22.07.2008 | ||
LU | 22.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CY | 21.11.2007 | |
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
AT | 22.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 21.11.2007 | |
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 21.11.2007 | |
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 21.11.2007 | |
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO0007965 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-9 * page 14, line 19 - line 23 * * page 15, line 15 - line 18 * * page 17, line 25 - line 26 * * page 19, line 4 - line 10; example -; claims 1,4,7; table - *; | [Y]EP0031537 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 15 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 19 * * page 13, line 13 - line 18 * * page 14, line 13 - line 20 * * example 3; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4937393 (MASUDA TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 14 - line 50; examples 1-9,11-31,34-45; claim 1 *; | [Y]GB2068408 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [Y] 10,11 * page 2, line 45 - line 58; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0780147 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * page 1, line 25 - line 39 * * page 1, line 48 - line 54 * * page 2, line 3 - line 16 * * page 6, line 45 - line 52; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE10022465 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * paragraphs [0023] , [0028] - [0030]; figure - * |