EP1543852 - Blood treating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/25] | BLOOD TREATING APPARATUS AND BLOOD TREATING METHOD | ||
[2009/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikkiso Company Limited 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | [2009/33] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Nikkiso Company Limited 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OISHI, Takayuki c/o NIKKISO COMPANY LIMITED 498-1 Shizutani Haibara-cho, Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Yoshihiro c/o NIKKISO COMPANY LIMITED 498-1 Shizutani Haibara-cho, Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0404 / JP | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03765273.2 | 19.06.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003JP07760 | Priority number, date | JP20020209331 | 18.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002209331 | JP20030132110 | 09.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003132110 | [2005/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004009155 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1543852 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1543852 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/14 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
A61M1/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/1613 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/166 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/34 (KR);
A61M1/361 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3626 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3627 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3327 (KR);
A61M2205/52 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2230/207 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/45] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blutbehandlungsgerät | [2009/09] | English: | Blood treating apparatus | [2009/09] | French: | Appareil pour le traitement du sang | [2009/09] |
Former [2005/25] | BLUTBEHANDLUNGSGERÄT UND BLUTBEHANDLUNGSMETHODE | ||
Former [2005/25] | BLOOD TREATING APPARATUS AND BLOOD TREATING METHOD | ||
Former [2005/25] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU SANG | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | Translation filed | 17.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 23.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4469593 (ISHIHARA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 5, line 6 - line 45 * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 33 * * column 10, line 30 - line 50 * * column 14, line 55 - column 15, line 47 *; | [X]DE4024434 (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 4 - line 41 * * column 11, line 42 - line 50 *; | [X]WO9702057 (HOSPAL AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 18 * * claims 12-21 *; | [A]DE19821534 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 8* column 6, line 31 - line 45 * | International search | [Y]JPH11221275 (JMS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001000540 (JMS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002165877 (NIPRO CORP) |