EP1502289 - INFRARED THERMOPILE DETECTOR SYSTEM FOR SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESS MONITORING AND CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY MATERIALS, INC. 7 Commerce Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2005/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNO, Jose 13 Twilight Lane Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03765426.6 | 05.05.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003US13937 | Priority number, date | US20020140848 | 08.05.2002 Original published format: US 140848 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004010462 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1502289 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, H01L21/66, G01J3/42 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR);
G01J5/0014 (EP,US);
G01J5/12 (EP,US);
H01L21/67253 (EP,US);
G01J5/0007 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/05] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFRAROT-THERMOPILE-DETEKTORSYSTEM FÜR DIE HALBLEITERPROZESSÜBERWACHUNG UND -REGELUNG | [2005/05] | English: | INFRARED THERMOPILE DETECTOR SYSTEM FOR SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESS MONITORING AND CONTROL | [2005/05] | French: | SYSTEME CAPTEUR INFRAROUGE A THERMOPILES POUR LE CONTROLE ET LA REGULATION DE PROCESSUS FAISANT INTERVENIR DES SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5100479 (WISE KENSALL D [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * column 1, line 14 - line 22 * * column 3, line 5 - line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5716428 (IMAMURA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-40* column 3, line 29 - line 64 *; | [Y]EP1195450 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 1-40 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] *; | [XI]US6370950 (LAMMERINK THEODORUS SIMON JOSE [NL]) [X] 30 * claims 1-3,11,14 * [I] 1-29,31-40; | [XI] - Schilz Jürgen, "Applications of thermoelectric infrared sensors (Thermopiles): Gas detection by infrared absorption", (20000822), pages 1 - 11, URL: http://optoelectronics.perkinelmer.com/content/applicationnotes/app_gasdetection.pdf, (20091210), XP002559531 [X] 1 * paragraphs [02.1] , [ 2.2]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [03.5] , [ 4.1] * [I] 2-40 | International search | [A]US6348650 (ENDO HARUYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5834777 (WONG JACOB Y [US]); | [A]US6469303 (SUN HONG T [US], et al); | [A]US4935345 (GUILBEAU ERIC J [US], et al); | [A]US5589689 (KOSKINEN YRJOE [FI]); | [A]US5047352 (STETTER JOSEPH R [US], et al); | [A]US5650624 (WONG JACOB Y [US]); | [A]US5721430 (WONG JACOB Y [US]) | by applicant | US6370950 | - JURGEN SCHILZ, Applications of Thermoelectric Infrared Sensors (Thermopiles): Gas Detection by Infrared Absorption; NDIR, PERKINELMER OPTOELECTRONICS GMBH, (20000822), pages 1 - 11 |