EP1545986 - ADJUSTABLE HEIGHT CORNER FITTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brennan, James F. Jr. 876 Land Street East Riverton, NJ 08077 / US | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Dorschner, David, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Dorschner, David, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2005/26] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 03765668.3 | 18.07.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US22379 | Priority number, date | US20020201330 | 23.07.2002 Original published format: US 201330 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004009453 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1545986 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545986 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
B60P7/132 (EP,US);
B65D90/0026 (EP,US);
Y10T24/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTIKAL VERSTELLBARER ECKBESCHLAG | [2005/26] | English: | ADJUSTABLE HEIGHT CORNER FITTING | [2005/26] | French: | PIECE DE COIN DE HAUTEUR REGLABLE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3456830 (GOLDER GERALD WILLIAM) [A] 1 * column 7, lines 8-20 ** figure 4 * | International search | [X]US3722714 (MORRIS J, et al); | [A]US5678375 (JUOLA TUOMO [FI]); | [A]US5847537 (PARMLEY SR DANIEL W [US]); | [A]US6364584 (TAYLOR PATRICK ASHER [US]) |