EP1537089 - COMPOUNDS COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytokinetics, Inc. 280 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2005/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGNES, Gustave, Cytokinetics, Inc. 280 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Whitney, W., Cytokinetics, Inc. 280 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
YAO, Bing, Cytokinetics, Inc. 280 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
MORGANS, David, J., Jr., Cytokinetics, Inc. 280 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
MCDONALD, Andrew, Cytokinetics, Inc. 280 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/23] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03766028.9 | 23.07.2003 | [2005/23] | WO2003US23319 | Priority number, date | US20020398224P | 23.07.2002 Original published format: US 398224 P | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004009036 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1537089 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/70, A61K31/502 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D239/70 (EP,US);
C07D239/88 (EP,US);
C07D239/91 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D475/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Extension states | AL | 01.02.2005 | LT | 01.02.2005 | LV | 01.02.2005 | MK | 01.02.2005 | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN, ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2005/23] | English: | COMPOUNDS COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2005/23] | French: | COMPOSES, COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0198278 (CYTOKINETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,10* claim 1 * | International search | [A]US5939421 (PALANKI MOORTHY S S [US], et al); | [A]US6156758 (KUNG PEI-PEI [US], et al) |