EP1558796 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INJECTING A LIQUID COLOUR INTO A POLYMER MELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | ||
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Saurer GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELBING, Ulrich Eifgenweg 13 51399 Burscheid / DE | 02 /
STAUSBERG, Georg Roswitha-von-Gandersheim-Weg 13 42897 Remscheid / DE | 03 /
ALEXANDER, Jörg Tenter Weg 43 42897 Remscheid / DE | 04 /
HASENBURG, Jürgen Herbecker Str. 14 42477 Radevormwald / DE | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03766144.4 | 09.07.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003EP07435 | Priority number, date | DE2002133468 | 24.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10233468 | [2005/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004013386 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1558796 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558796 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D01D1/06, B29C47/10, B29B7/94, B01F15/04, F04C2/08, F04C11/00, F04B23/02 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
F04C14/08 (EP,US);
D01D1/06 (KR);
B29B7/94 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/29 (EP,US);
B29C48/37 (EP,US);
D01D1/065 (EP,US);
F04B13/00 (EP,US);
F04B23/14 (EP,US);
F04C11/001 (EP,US);
F04C13/001 (EP,US);
B29C48/365 (EP);
B29C48/387 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0005 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0032 (EP,US);
B29K2995/002 (EP,US);
F04C13/002 (EP,US);
F04C2220/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINSPEISEN EINER FLÜSSIGEN FARBE IN EINE POLYMERSCHMELZE | [2005/31] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INJECTING A LIQUID COLOUR INTO A POLYMER MELT | [2005/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DESTINES A ALIMENTER UNE PEINTURE LIQUIDE DANS UNE FUSION POLYMERE | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 28.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.10.2008 | CZ | 01.10.2008 | DK | 01.10.2008 | EE | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | IE | 01.10.2008 | RO | 01.10.2008 | SI | 01.10.2008 | SK | 01.10.2008 | BG | 01.01.2009 | SE | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | HU | 02.04.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
HU | 02.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 01.10.2008 | |
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | SI | 01.10.2008 | |
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/16] | SI | 01.10.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR991627 (DETREZ RENE) [A] 13* figure 1 *; | [X]US3023764 (DOOLEY WILLIAM P, et al) [X] 1-12,20-23 * column 2, lines 7-32 *; | [X]GB1311162 (SLACK & PARR LTD) [X] 1-12,20-23 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US4221692 (LAMBERTINI GIORGIO, et al) [X] 1-12,20-23 * column 2, line 61 * * column 3, lines 28-49 * [Y] 14-19; | [A]EP0945171 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-12,20-23 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19956251 (SML MASCHINENGESELLSCHAFT MBH [AT]) [DA] 1,20 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP1008750 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 13 * pages 1-2; claims 1-8 * [Y] 14-19; | [A]EP1020645 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1-12,20-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US6232371 (CASWELL DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1-12,20-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US6254363 (FINK JAMES ALLEN [US]) [X] 13 * column 2, lines 12-.27; figure 1 *; | [PX]WO03035346 (COLORMATRIX EUROPE LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 13-19 * the whole document * |