EP1525576 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE GENERATION OF A COMPLEX SPECTRAL REPRESENTATION OF A TIME-DISCRETE SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDLER, Bernd Hemelingstrasse 10 30419 Hannover / DE | 02 /
GEYERSBERGER, Stefan Otto-Roth-Str. 90 97076 Würzburg / DE | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03766165.9 | 14.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003EP07608 | Priority number, date | DE20021034130 | 26.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10234130 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004013839 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525576 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525576 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10L11/00 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G10L25/48 (EP,US);
G10L19/00 (US);
G10L25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2005/46] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINER KOMPLEXEN SPEKTRALDARSTELLUNG EINES ZEITDISKRETEN SIGNALS | [2005/17] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE GENERATION OF A COMPLEX SPECTRAL REPRESENTATION OF A TIME-DISCRETE SIGNAL | [2005/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE GENERER UNE REPRESENTATION SPECTRALE COMPLEXE D'UN SIGNAL A VALEURS DISCRETES EN TEMPS | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 23.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5890106 (BOSI-GOLDBERG MARINA [US]); | [A] - MALVAR H, "A modulated complex lapped transform and its applications to audio processing", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1999. PROCEEDINGS., 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PHOENIX, AZ, USA 15-19 MARCH 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990315), ISBN 0-7803-5041-3, pages 1421 - 1424, XP010328336 | [DA] - VINTON M S ET AL, "Scalable and progressive audio codec", 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.01CH37221), 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS, SALT LAKE CITY, UT, USA, 7-11 MAY 2001, 2001, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-7041-4, pages 3277 - 3280 vol.5, XP002263951 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2001.940358 | [A] - BERG A P ET AL, "A survey of mixed transform techniques for speech and image coding", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1999. ISCAS '99. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 30 MAY-2 JUNE 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990530), ISBN 0-7803-5471-0, pages 106 - 109, XP010341151 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1999.779953 |