EP1523800 - DRUM COMMUTATOR FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolektor Group d.o.o. Vojkova ulica 10, p.p. 85 5280 Idrija / SI | [2008/50] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Kolektor Group D.O.O. Vojkova 10, p.p. 85 5280 Idrija / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POTOCNIK, Joze Gortanova 2a 5280 Idrija / SI | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2005/16] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03766210.3 | 18.07.2003 | [2005/16] | WO2003EP07813 | Priority number, date | DE20021033712 | 24.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10233712 | [2005/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004013945 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1523800 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1523800 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K13/10 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
H02K13/105 (EP,KR,US);
H01R39/04 (KR);
H02K3/16 (KR);
H02K5/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/16] | Title | German: | TROMMELKOMMUTATOR FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | [2005/16] | English: | DRUM COMMUTATOR FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2005/16] | French: | COMMUTATEUR A TAMBOUR POUR MACHINE ELECTRIQUE | [2005/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.05.2009 | CZ | 13.05.2009 | DK | 13.05.2009 | EE | 13.05.2009 | FI | 13.05.2009 | IE | 13.05.2009 | NL | 13.05.2009 | RO | 13.05.2009 | SI | 13.05.2009 | SK | 13.05.2009 | TR | 13.05.2009 | AT | 18.07.2009 | LU | 18.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | BG | 13.08.2009 | GB | 13.08.2009 | SE | 13.08.2009 | GR | 14.08.2009 | ES | 24.08.2009 | PT | 13.09.2009 | HU | 14.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
AT | 18.07.2009 | ||
LU | 18.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
GB | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
HU | 14.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
AT | 18.07.2009 | ||
LU | 18.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
GB | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
AT | 18.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
GB | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
AT | 18.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 13.05.2009 | |
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 13.05.2009 | |
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 13.05.2009 | |
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | FI | 13.05.2009 | |
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 24.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS57177253 ; | [AD]US6285106 (OKI SHIGETAKA [JP]) [AD] 1-3,7,13,14,17-19,21,22 * column 3, line 12 - column 7, line 54; figures 1,2,5,7,8,14,23 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830127), vol. 007, no. 021, Database accession no. (E - 155), & JP57177253 A 19821030 (ISHIZUKA DENSHI KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,5-8,10,13,14,17,18,27 * abstract * |