EP1525114 - LOCKING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEIPER GmbH & Co. KG Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOCK, Eckhard Bahnweg 3 67551 Worms / DE | 02 /
HÄNSEL, Richard Am Alzeyer Tor 10 55237 Flonheim / DE | 03 /
KLEIN, Mario Tevesstrasse 53 78176 Blumberg / DE | 04 /
KRAUS, Martin Am Hofacker 29 67806 Katzenbach / DE | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63-65 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03766220.2 | 18.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003EP07836 | Priority number, date | DE2002135141 | 01.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10235141 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004012959 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525114 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525114 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/235, B60N2/433 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
B60N2/433 (EP,US);
B60N2/2352 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/17] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2005/17] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE SEAT | [2005/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR UN SIEGE DE VEHICULE | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.03.2009 | [2011/14] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0176907 (KEIPER GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10 * page 4, line 21 - page 10, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [XP]EP1279552 (KEIPER GMBH & CO [DE]) [XP] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [XP]WO03010025 (KEIPER GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [XP] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [XP]EP1260404 (KEIPER GMBH & CO [DE]) [XP] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002008419 (BOLTZE WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US5540117 (HAENSEL RICHARD [DE], et al) |