EP1539111 - ORAL DOSAGE FORMS OF WATER INSOLUBLE DRUGS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STIEFEL LABORATORIES, INC. 255 Alhambra Circle Coral Gables, FL 33134 / US | [2007/07] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAMBURI, Ranga, Raju 1805 Bradford Drive Apartment 121 Greenville, NC 27858 / US | 02 /
KERR, John, Elgin 755 Corbett Street Winterville, NC 28590 / US | 03 /
LAWSON, Allen, Lee 3746 Hoots Rd., Bldg.8 P38 Greenville, NC 27858 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Breepoel, Peter M. DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 03766786.2 | 05.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003NL00563 | Priority number, date | US20020401121P | 05.08.2002 Original published format: US 401121 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004012714 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539111 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/50, A61K9/28, A61K31/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K9/1676 (EP);
A61K9/5078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORALE DOSIERFORMEN VON WASSERUNL SLICHEN ARZNEIMITTELN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAF R | [2005/24] | English: | ORAL DOSAGE FORMS OF WATER INSOLUBLE DRUGS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2005/24] | French: | FORMES GALENIQUES ORALES DE MEDICAMENTS INSOLUBLES DANS L'EAU ET LEURS PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]EP1350508 (YUNG SHIN PHARM IND CO LTD) [E] 1-41 * abstract * * example - *; | [PX]WO02062318 (DSM NV ;KERR JOHN ELGIN (US); NAMBURI RANGA RAJU (US)) [PX] 1-8,15-23,28-41 * page 4, line 15 - line 19 * * page 6, line 5 - line 10 * * example 1 *; | [DA]WO0003697 (CONDE VALENTIN FLORENT VICTOR ;GILIS PAUL MARIE VICTOR (BE); JANSS) [DA] 1-41 * the whole document * | [X] - MATHIR Z M ET AL, "IN VITRO CHARACTERIZATION OF A CONTROLLED-RELEASE CHLORPHENIRAMINE MALEAT DELIVERY SYSTEM PREPARED BY THE AIR-SUSPENSION TECHNIQUE", JOURNAL OF MICROENCAPSULATION, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS INC. LONDON, GB, (19971101), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 0265-2048, pages 743 - 751, XP000703651 [X] 1-7,13-21,23,28,29,34-41 * page 744, paragraph L - page 745, line 10 * |