EP1527563 - MANAGED ROAMING FOR WLANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wavelink Corporation 6985 Union Park Ave., Suite 335 Midvale, UT 84047-4155 / US | [2010/07] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Wavelink Corporation 11332 NE 122nd Way, Suite 300 Kirkland, WA 98034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHELAN, Robert 63011th Avenue West Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 02 /
VAN WAGENEN, Lamar 980 E. Diana Hills Way Sandy, UT 84094 / US | 03 /
MORRIS, Roy 8812 NE 191st Place Bothell, WA 98011 / US | [2007/01] |
Former [2005/18] | 01 /
WHELAN, Robert 545 Kirkland Avenue Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | ||
02 /
VAN WAGENEN, Lamar 980 E. Diana Hills Way Sandy, UT 84094 / US | |||
03 /
MORRIS, Roy 8812 NE 191st Place Bothell, WA 98011 / US | Representative(s) | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
Former [2011/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/43] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03767083.3 | 31.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003US24180 | Priority number, date | US20020211841 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: US 211841 | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004014024 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1527563 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
H04W12/062 (EP,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W48/02 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTETES ROAMING FÜR LOKALE FUNKNETZE | [2005/18] | English: | MANAGED ROAMING FOR WLANS | [2005/18] | French: | GESTION D'ITINERANCE POUR RESEAUX LOCAUX SANS FIL | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2006 | 31.07.2011 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2011 | 31.07.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PY]US2003117985 (FUJII KAZUO [JP], et al) [PY] 1,3,29,37,40,49,52,63,74,75 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 47 - paragraph 53 *; | [Y]US5159625 (ZICKER ROBERT G [US]) [Y] 1,3,29,37,40,49,52,63,74,75 * abstract * * column 16, line 32 - line 50 *; | [A]EP1081895 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,29,37,40,49,52,63,74,75 * abstract * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 46 *; | [A]US5838730 (CRIPPS PETER K [US]) [A] 1,3,29,37,40,49,52,63,74,75 * column 26, line 45 - column 27, line 66 * * column 30, line 38 - line 61 * | [PA] - SALKINTZIS A K ET AL, "WLAN-GPRS INTEGRATION FOR NEXT-GENERATION MOBILE DATA NETWORKS", IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200210), vol. 9, no. 5, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 112 - 123, XP001132263 [PA] 1,3,29,37,40,49,52,63,74,75 * page 117, column L, line 24 - line 40 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWC.2002.1043861 | Examination | EP1172969 | EP0913968 | US5933420 | US5724346 | WO0163842 | US2002085719 |