EP1539152 - DEVELOPMENT OF MUSCLE MASS IN A MAMMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.10.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nutraceutical Development Corporation 550 Club Drive, Suite 440 Montgomery, TX 77316 / US | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUMMERS, David P. 550 Club Drive, Suite 440 Montgomery, TX 77316 / US | 02 /
DAVIDSON, James 108 North Alfred, Suite 200 Alexandria, VA 22314 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK RAWORTH HOUSE 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 03767157.5 | 02.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US24365 | Priority number, date | US20020400649P | 02.08.2002 Original published format: US 400649 P | US20030475131P | 02.06.2003 Original published format: US 475131 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004012674 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539152 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/465 (EP,US);
A61P21/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTWICKLUNG DER MUSKELMASSE IN EINEM SûUGETIER | [2005/24] | English: | DEVELOPMENT OF MUSCLE MASS IN A MAMMAL | [2005/24] | French: | DEVELOPPEMENT DE LA MASSE MUSCULAIRE CHEZ UN MAMMIFERE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.02.2008 | 31.08.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ALAN L. HARVEY, "Actions of drugs on developing skeletal muscle", PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (1980), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 1 - 41, XP002396315 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0163-7258(80)90067-4 | International search | [A]US6417205 (COOKE JOHN [US], et al) |