EP1585520 - THERAPEUTIC FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF BETA-AMYLOID RELATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELLUS Health (International) Limited Parc scientifique EPFL, PSE Ecublens 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2008/31] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Neurochem (International) Limited PSE-Parc Scientifique sur le site de l'Ecole Polytechnique Féderale de Lausanne 1015 Lausanne (Ecublens) / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERVAIS, Francine 1003 Bellevue Ile Bizard, Québec H9C 2X5 / CA | 02 /
BELLINI, Francesco 307 Portland Avenue Town of Mount Royal, Québec H3R 1V4 / CA | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Klaus Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Hoffmann, Klaus Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03767368.8 | 24.12.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003CA02011 | Priority number, date | US20020436379P | 24.12.2002 Original published format: US 436379 P | US20030482214P | 23.06.2003 Original published format: US 482214 P | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004058258 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1585520 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K31/185, A61P25/28 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/185 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/07 (EP,US);
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/10 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/185, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/07, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/08, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | 25.07.2005 | LT | 25.07.2005 | LV | 25.07.2005 | MK | 25.07.2005 | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BETA AMYLOID-ASSOZIIERTEN KRANKHEITEN | [2005/42] | English: | THERAPEUTIC FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF BETA-AMYLOID RELATED DISEASES | [2005/42] | French: | FORMULATIONS THERAPEUTIQUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES LIEES A LA BETA-AMYL0IDE | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9628187 (UNIV KINGSTON [CA], et al) [YD] 1-394 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9940909 (NEUROCHEM INC [CA]) [Y] 1-394 * claim - *; | [Y]WO9959571 (NEUROCHEM INC [CA]) [Y] 1-394 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 3; claims 10-13 *; | [YD]WO0185093 (NEUROCHEM INC [CA]) [YD] 1-394 * claims 1-6,25-28 *; | [Y] - DORRONSORO I ET AL, "Peripheral and dual binding site inhibitors of acetylcholinesterase as neurodegenerative disease-modifying agents", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS 2003 UNITED KINGDOM, (2003), vol. 13, no. 11, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 1725 - 1732, XP002275487 [Y] 1-394 * the whole document * | [Y] - KISILEVSKY R ET AL, "ARRESTING AMYLOIDOSIS IN VIVO USING SMALL-MOLECULE ANIONIC SULPHONATES OR SULPHATES: IMPLICATIONS FOR ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, US, (19950201), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 143 - 148, XP000611547 [Y] 1-394 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0295-143 | [A] - KISILEVSKY R, "ANTI-AMYLOID DRUGS POTENTIAL IN THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH AGING", DRUGS AND AGING, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, NZ, (19960201), vol. 8, no. 2, ISSN 1170-229X, pages 75 - 83, XP000610542 [A] 1-394 * the whole document * |