EP1567973 - CHIPCARD HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUG, Klaus Kapellenstrasse 16 78727 Oberndorf / DE | 02 /
RIESTER, Thomas Bozener Strasse 10 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 03 /
WAHLER, Torsten Scheffelstrasse 4 78073 Bad Dürrheim / DE | [2005/35] | Application number, filing date | 03767414.0 | 10.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003DE03718 | Priority number, date | DE2002156716 | 04.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10256716 | [2005/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004051556 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1567973 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567973 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K13/08 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
G06K13/085 (EP,US);
G06K13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Title | German: | CHIPKARTENAUFNAHME | [2005/35] | English: | CHIPCARD HOUSING | [2005/35] | French: | ELEMENT DE RECEPTION POUR CARTE A PUCE | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.05.2006 | CZ | 17.05.2006 | EE | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | IE | 17.05.2006 | RO | 17.05.2006 | SI | 17.05.2006 | SK | 17.05.2006 | TR | 17.05.2006 | BG | 17.08.2006 | DK | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | LU | 10.11.2006 | HU | 18.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
TR | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
LU | 10.11.2006 | ||
HU | 18.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
HU | 18.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 17.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4800551 (NORRIS PHILIP R [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 38 *; | [X]DE19809619 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 66; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19815549 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 62 - column 5, line 39 *; | [A]DE19947162 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1,5* column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 57 *; | [A]DE10112061 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025] * |