EP1571959 - CLEANING SYSTEM COMPRISING A BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMRATH, Joachim Raiffeisenstr. 7 89429 Bachhagel / DE | 02 /
SPIELMANNLEITNER, Markus Rosenberger Str. 49 73479 Ellwangen / DE | 03 /
WETZL, Gerhard Hohweierstr. 15 89567 Sontheim / DE | [2005/37] | Application number, filing date | 03767574.1 | 19.11.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003EP12961 | Priority number, date | DE2002156089 | 02.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10256089 | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004049892 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571959 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571959 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/40 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
A47L11/4013 (EP,US);
A47L11/28 (EP,US);
A47L11/40 (EP,US);
A47L11/4066 (EP,US);
A47L13/256 (EP,US);
A47L13/48 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSANLAGE MIT BASISSTATION | [2005/37] | English: | CLEANING SYSTEM COMPRISING A BASE STATION | [2005/37] | French: | SYSTEME DE NETTOYAGE COMPORTANT UNE STATION DE BASE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 16.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.01.2007 | CZ | 17.01.2007 | DK | 17.01.2007 | EE | 17.01.2007 | FI | 17.01.2007 | IE | 17.01.2007 | NL | 17.01.2007 | RO | 17.01.2007 | SI | 17.01.2007 | SK | 17.01.2007 | TR | 17.01.2007 | BG | 18.04.2007 | PT | 18.06.2007 | HU | 18.07.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/34] | CY | 17.01.2007 | |
CZ | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
EE | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 17.01.2007 | |
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
EE | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 17.01.2007 | |
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 17.01.2007 | |
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | DK | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | DK | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 17.01.2007 | |
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0797948 (DIEHL JENS [DE]) [X] 12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002153185 (SONG JEONG-GON [KR], et al); | [A]GB2313190 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]DE1703831 (STEINRINGER GUENTER [DE]); | [A]US5360307 (SCHEMM JERRY D [US], et al) |