EP1573053 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE HOMEOSTASIS OF HAIRY SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERSOHN, Dirk Uferstrasse 48 50996 Köln / DE | 02 /
SCHLOTMANN, Kordula Am Hirschgraben 7 40627 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
GASSENMEIER, Thomas Mannheimer Weg 16 40229 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
HOLTKÖTTER, Olaf Helene-Weber-Weg 17 50354 Hürth / DE | 05 /
CONRADT, Marcus 170, Marais Street 0181 Pretoria / ZA | 06 /
HOFMANN, Kay Ehrenfeldgürtel 139 50823 Köln / DE | [2005/37] | Application number, filing date | 03767789.5 | 11.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003EP14070 | Priority number, date | DE20021060931 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10260931 | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004059002 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573053 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/148 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER HOMÖOSTASE BEHAARTER HAUT | [2005/37] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE HOMEOSTASIS OF HAIRY SKIN | [2005/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE L'HOMEOSTASIE DE PEAU PILEUSE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 06.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02053774 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W *; | [AD]EP0761822 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US]) [AD] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W *; | [Y] - RUISSEN VAN F ET AL, "A partial transcriptome of human epidermis", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (200205), vol. 79, no. 5, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 671 - 678, XP002227529 [Y] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.2002.6756 | [Y] - JANSEN B J H ET AL, "Serial analysis of gene expression in differentiated cultures of human epidermal keratinocytes", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010115), vol. 116, no. 1, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 12 - 22, XP002226878 [Y] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1747.2001.00218.x | [A] - KOEHRER ET AL., "EST", GENBANK, NCBI, (20030904), Database accession no. AL079930, URL: NCBI, XP002324249 [A] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * the whole document * | [A] - COTSARELIS G ET AL, "Towards a molecular understanding of hair loss and its treatment", TRENDS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, XX, XX, (200107), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 293 - 301, XP002254495 [A] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4914(01)02027-5 | [A] - PAUS R ET AL, "THE BIOLOGY OF HAIR FOLLICLES", PHYSIOPATHOLOGY OF ENDOCRINE DISEASE AND MECHANISMS OF HORMONE ACTION, XX, XX, (199908), vol. 341, no. 7, pages 491 - 497, XP002941005 [A] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W * | [A] - XU X ET AL, "Differential cyclin D expression in the human hair follicle bulge", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, 63rd Annual Meeting of the Society for Investigative Dermatology;Los Angeles, California, USA; May 15-18, 2002, (200207), vol. 119, no. 1, ISSN 0022-202X, page 293, XP001189372 [A] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W * | [A] - HARMON C S ET AL, "IL-1ALPHA INHIBITS HUMAN HAIR FOLLICLE GROWTH AND HAIR FIBER PRODUCTION IN WHOLE-ORGAN CULTURES", LYMPHOKINE AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH, MARY ANN LIEBERT, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (19930801), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 1056-5477, pages 197 - 203, XP000571161 [A] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W * | [A] - HUH N ET AL, "ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A NOVEL HAIR FOLLICLE-SPECIFIC GENE, HACL-1", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199405), vol. 102, no. 5, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 716 - 720, XP001068799 [A] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1523-1747.ep12375385 | [A] - OTA, T. ET AL., "Homo sapiens cDNA FLJ12009 fis, clone HEMBB1001618", GENBANK, NCBI, (20040130), Database accession no. ak022071, XP002277002 [A] 1-4,11-16,18-24,27,29 * column W * | [TD] - PANDEY A ET AL, "Proteomics to study genes and genomes", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (20000615), vol. 405, no. 6788, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 837 - 846, XP002275296 [TD] 12,13 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35015709 | [TD] - SUTCLIFFE ET AL, "TOGA: an automated parsing technology for analyzing expression of nearly all genes", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (20000229), vol. 97, no. 5, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1976 - 1981, XP002135936 [TD] 14,15 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.040537997 |