Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1573053
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.10.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
21.06.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.05.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2007 |
First examination report |
|
05.12.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.07.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
29.07.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
05.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
25.05.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
23.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|