Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006088852 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0314070 | 11.12.2003 | DE10260931 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003292230 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0314070 | 11.12.2003 | DE10260931 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1573053 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP0314070 | 11.12.2003 | DE10260931 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004059002 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2005 | A3 | WO2004059002 | 15.07.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10260931 | 20.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10260931 | 01.06.2006 | B4 | DE10260931 | 08.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10260931 | 20.12.2002 |