EP1569656 - PHOSPHOANTIGENS FOR REGULATING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innate Pharma Immeuble Grand Pré, 121, ancien Chemin de Cassis 13009 Marseille / FR | [2010/09] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Innate Pharma Immeuble Grand Pré, 121, ancien chemin de Cassis 13009 Marseille / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMAGNE, François Bat. A3, Les Hauts de Fontsainte F-13600 La Ciotat / FR | 02 /
SICARD, Hélène 19 Beauvallon Centre F-13009 Marseille / FR | 03 /
TIOLLIER, Jérôme 17 rue Bienvenu F-13008 Marseille / FR | 04 /
BELMANT, Christian 36 Impasse du Hameau de la Tour 83140 Six-Fours-Les-Plages / FR | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Gallois, Valérie, et al Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Gallois, Valérie, et al Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03768074.1 | 02.12.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003IB06375 | Priority number, date | EP20020292963 | 02.12.2002 Original published format: EP 02292963 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004050096 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1569656 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1569656 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/66, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P35/04 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/2013, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOSPHOANTIGEN ENTHALTENE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR REGULIERUNG VON IMMUNEREAKTIONEN | [2009/42] | English: | PHOSPHOANTIGENS FOR REGULATING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE | [2005/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET TECHNIQUES DE REGULATION DE REPONSE IMMUNE CHEZ UN PATIENT | [2005/36] |
Former [2005/36] | PHOSPHOANTIGEN ENTHALTENE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR REGULIERING VON IMMUNEREAKTIONEN | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2010 | BE | 03.03.2010 | CY | 03.03.2010 | CZ | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | EE | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | IT | 03.03.2010 | RO | 03.03.2010 | SE | 03.03.2010 | SI | 03.03.2010 | SK | 03.03.2010 | TR | 03.03.2010 | BG | 03.06.2010 | GR | 04.06.2010 | ES | 14.06.2010 | PT | 05.07.2010 | HU | 04.09.2010 | GB | 02.12.2010 | IE | 02.12.2010 | LU | 02.12.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
GB | 02.12.2010 | ||
IE | 02.12.2010 | ||
LU | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
GB | 02.12.2010 | ||
IE | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
GB | 02.12.2010 | ||
IE | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 03.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO0012519 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [XD] 1,2,26,27,30,73 * page 21, line 19 - line 23 *; | [DX]WO0059916 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [DX] 49,57-72,74-77 * page 17, line 21 - line 25; example 14; tables I,II *; | [X]US2002142996 (OKUNO TETSUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,16-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0050] , [ 0052] *; | [DXP]WO03009855 (JOMAA PHARMAKA GMBH [DE], et al) [DXP] 1,2,26,40-42,50,51,78 * p. 10, compounds 15 (=CHDMAPP) and 17 (=HDMAPP) *; page 13, line 8 - line 31; claims 1-42 *; | [DX] - KUNZMANN VOLKER ET AL, "Stimulation of gammadelta T cells by aminobisphosphonates and induction of antiplasma cell activity in multiple myeloma", BLOOD, &, (20000715), vol. 96, no. 2, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 384 - 392, XP002276947 [DX] 1,16-20,25,26,40,73 * abstract * | [PX] - WILHELM MARTIN ET AL, "gammadelta T cells for immune therapy of patients with lymphoid malignancies.", BLOOD, &, (20030701), vol. 102, no. 1, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 200 - 206, XP002276948 [PX] 1,2,57-65,67,68,71-77 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2002-12-3665 | [PX] - PROMT, (20031215), Database accession no. 2003:627750, URL: STN, XP002276950 [PX] 1,2,16-28,49,73 * abstract * | [X] - PHIN, (20020308), Database accession no. :2002:6085, URL: STN, XP002276951 [X] 1,2,16-28,49,73 * abstract * | [ ] - ANONYMOUS, "Innate gets Euros2 million loan from French agency", SCRIP, (20020308), no. 2727, page 7 | [X] - "Innate Pharma exceeds objectives in obtaining funding for first clinical trials.", CBNB, Database accession no. 19(9):12851, URL: STN, XP002276952 [X] 1,2,16-28,49,73 * abstract * | [T] - MONTALVETTI ANDREA ET AL, "Farnesyl pyrophosphate synthase is an essential enzyme in Trypanosoma brucei: In vitro RNA interference and in vivo inhibition studies", J. BIOL. CHEM.; JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY MAY 9 2003, (20030509), vol. 278, no. 19, pages 17075 - 17083, XP002276949 [T] 1-79 *Fig. 1, Formula 10 phosphostim * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M210467200 |