EP1630731 - MEDICAL DEVICE RENTAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGUCHI, Toshiaki 71-3, Saiwaicho 5-chome Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo 190-0002 / JP | 02 /
KUROSHIMA, Hisashi 16-243, Sandacho 5-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0832 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Eiri 2-13, Hoshigaoka 3-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-0038 / JP | 04 /
HASEGAWA, Hitoshi 279, Morookacho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0002 / JP | 05 /
GOCHO, Masanori 1-8, Owadacho 3-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0045 / JP | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03768224.2 | 25.12.2003 | [2006/09] | WO2003JP16691 | Priority number, date | JP20030158461 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003158461 | [2006/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109572 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630731 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G16H40/40 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q30/0645 (KR);
G16H40/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | MIETSYSTEM FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2006/09] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE RENTAL SYSTEM | [2006/09] | French: | SYSTEME DE LOCATION DE DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2005 | Translation filed | 20.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 16.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [Y]JPH05197768 (SHIMADZU CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2002163575 (NEC SOFTWARE KYUSHU LTD); | [Y]JP2002236859 (NIPPON CARE SUPPLY KK); | [Y]JP2002304584 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) |