EP1727093 - 3D VIDEOGAME SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tdvision Corporation S.A. DE C.V. Pina 201-A, Col. Nueva Santa Maria México, D.F. 02800 / MX | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTIÉRREZ NOVELO, Manuel Rafael Pina 201-A,Col. Nueva Santa Maria México, D.F. 02800 / MX | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03768395.0 | 19.12.2003 | [2006/48] | WO2003MX00112 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005059842 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1727093 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00, H04N13/00, A63F13/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
A63F13/40 (EP,KR,US);
G06T17/00 (KR);
A63F13/21 (US);
A63F13/24 (EP,KR);
A63F13/52 (US);
A63F13/5252 (EP,KR,US);
G06T15/00 (US);
G06T15/005 (US);
G06T15/205 (US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/383 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1043 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/66 (US);
A63F2300/6669 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/8082 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 3D-VIDEOSPIEL-SYSTEM | [2006/48] | English: | 3D VIDEOGAME SYSTEM | [2006/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE JEU VIDEO 3D | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | Translation filed | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | 19.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 02.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/15] | 22.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP11194385.8 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 20.01.2012 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 19.07.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02109493 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH08149519 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]DE19806547 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [X]US6496183 (BAR-NAHUM GUY [US]); | [A]JP2003067784 (CANON KK) |