EP1468191 - VAPOR JET VACUUM PUMP HAVING EJECTOR STAGE IN FORELINE CONDUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian, Inc. 3120 Hansen Way, D-102 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HABLANIAN, Marsbed 42 Longfellow Road Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara The Coach House 6-8 Swakeley's Road Ickenham, Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03768663.1 | 03.11.2003 | [2004/43] | WO2003US35214 | Priority number, date | US20020290866 | 07.11.2002 Original published format: US 290866 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004044435 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468191 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1468191 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04F9/00 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
F04F9/04 (EP,US);
F04F9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/09] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DAMPFSAUGSTRAHLPUMPE MIT EJEKTORPUMPENSTUFE | [2004/43] | English: | VAPOR JET VACUUM PUMP HAVING EJECTOR STAGE IN FORELINE CONDUIT | [2004/43] | French: | POMPE A VIDE A JET DE VAPEUR COMPRENANT UN ETAGE EJECTEUR DANS CONDUIT DE PREVIDE | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB564655 (STOKES MACHINE CO) [X] 1,5,11,14 * page 2, line 112 - page 3, line 122 * * figure 1 * [A] 15,20; | [XA]DE928314 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,5,11 * the whole document * [A] 15,20; | [A]US2797043 (GEROW GORDON P) [A] 1,2,7-9,11,12,15,16,19 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 75 * * figure - *; | [A]FR879667 (OERLIKON MASCHF) [A] 1,5,11,14,15,20 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 84 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]US4845360 (LANDFORS ARTHUR A [US]) [DA] 1,7-9,11,15 * abstract * * figure - * |