EP1560586 - THE USE OF AN ANTI-ALLERGY AGENT AND A STEROID TO TREAT ALLERGIC RHINITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [2006/02] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bosch 69, P.O. Box 62 6331 Hünenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAGLE, Gerald, D. 6309 Greenway Fort Worth, TX 76116 / US | 02 /
WALL, G., Michael 4417 Ledgeview Road Fort Worth, TX 76109 / US | 03 /
YANNI, John, M. 2821 Donnybrook Drive Burleson, TX 76028 / US | 04 /
JANI, Rajni 4621 Briarhaven Road Fort Worth, TX 76109 / US | 05 /
BHAGAT, Haresh, G. 6437 Elmcrest Court Fort Worth, TX 76132 / US | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Teipel, Stephan, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03768901.5 | 12.11.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003US36054 | Priority number, date | US20020425494P | 12.11.2002 Original published format: US 425494 P | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004043470 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1560586 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5513, A61K31/335, A61K31/575, A61K31/573, A61P27/14 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/5513 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/335 (KR);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/575 (EP,US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/575, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON EINEM ANTIALLERGIKUMS UND EINEM STEROID ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALLERGISCHE RHINITIS | [2005/32] | English: | THE USE OF AN ANTI-ALLERGY AGENT AND A STEROID TO TREAT ALLERGIC RHINITIS | [2005/32] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN AGENT ANTI-ALLERGIQUE ET D'UN STEROIDE POUR TRAITER UNE RHINITE ALLERGIQUE | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0135963 (ALCON UNIVERSAL LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1-10 * example -; claim - * [Y] 1-10; | [YD]WO9701337 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [YD] 1-10 * abstract *; | [PX]WO03049770 (ALCON INC [CH], et al) [PX] 1-10 * abstract * | [XY] - LANIER BOB Q ET AL, "Comparison of the efficacy of combined fluticasone propionate and olopatadine versus combined fluticasone propionate and fexofenadine for the treatment of allergic rhinoconjunctivitis induced by conjunctival allergen challenge.", CLINICAL THERAPEUTICS. JUL 2002, (200207), vol. 24, no. 7, ISSN 0149-2918, pages 1161 - 1174, XP002274753 [X] 1-10 * abstract * [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0149-2918(02)80027-3 | Examination | WO9746243 | - DAY AND CARILLO, "COMPARISON OF THE EFFICACY OF BUDESONIDE AND FLUTICASONE PROPIONATE AQUEOUS NASAL SPRAY FOR ONCE DAILY TREATMENT OF PERENNIAL ALLERGIC RHINITIS", J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (199812), pages 902 - 908, XP005686898 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(98)70326-4 | - NAYAK ET AL, "INTRANASAL FLUTICASONE PROPIONATE (FP) IS MORE EFFECTIVE THAN LORATADINE (LOR) FOR TREATMENT OF SEASONAL ALLERGIC RHINITIS", J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (199601), page 198, XP005581600 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(96)80281-8 |