EP1569987 - PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Porvair Filtration Group Limited 1 Concorde Close Segensworth Fareham Hampshire PO15 5RT / GB | [2013/50] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states PORVAIR FILTRATION GROUP LIMITED Clywedog Road South Wrexham LL13 9X3 / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COWIESON, David Richard 2 Acacia Court Llay Wrexham LL12 0TX / GB | 02 /
PILETSKY, Sergiy, A. 8 Harter Avenue Cranfield MK43 0EE / GB | [2013/51] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
COWIESON, David Richard 2 Acacia Court, Llay Wrexham LL12 0TX / GB | ||
02 /
PILETSKY, Sergiy, A. 8 Harter Avenue Cranfield MK43 0EE / GB | Representative(s) | Alcock, David D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Alcock, David D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/36] | Alcock, David D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03769666.3 | 28.10.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003GB04641 | Priority number, date | GB20020025133 | 29.10.2002 Original published format: GB 0225133 | GB20030015858 | 07.07.2003 Original published format: GB 0315858 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004039874 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1569987 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1569987 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, B01D69/12, B01J20/32, B01J20/30, C08J9/24 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B01J20/261 (EP,US);
B01J20/267 (EP,US);
B01J20/268 (EP,US);
B01J20/28016 (EP,US);
B01J20/28019 (EP,US);
B01J20/28023 (EP,US);
B01J20/28033 (EP,US);
B01J20/2808 (EP,US);
B01J20/3007 (EP,US);
B01J20/3057 (EP,US);
B01J20/321 (EP,US);
B01J20/3217 (EP,US);
B01J20/3246 (EP,US);
B01J20/3248 (EP,US);
B01J20/3251 (EP,US);
B01J20/3253 (EP,US);
B01J20/3255 (EP,US);
B01J20/327 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | C08J7/04, B01D69/12, B01J20/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN | [2005/36] | English: | PROCESS | [2005/36] | French: | PROCEDE | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Request for further processing for: | 30.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2003 | AT | 18.12.2013 | BE | 18.12.2013 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | ES | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | IT | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | NL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | GR | 19.03.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/29] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9636877 (NEOMECS INC [US]) [X] 1-41 * page 1, lines 5-10 * * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 27 * * page 7, line 33 - page 11, line 7 * * page 13, line 5 - page 14, line 25; example -; claim - *; | [X]US5798261 (KOONTZ STEVEN L [US]) [X] 1-41 * column 1, lines 24-29 * * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 33 * * column 8, line 33 - column 9, line 33 * * column 9, line 66 - column 12, line 10 * * column 12, line 44 - column 13, line 61; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0139881 (ELIPSA GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-41 * page 1, lines 9-13 * * page 6, line 5 - page 15, line 11; figure -; example -; claim 11 *; | [X]US5369012 (KOONTZ STEVEN L [US], et al) [X] 1-41 * column 1, lines 16-27 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 61 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 8 * * column 8, line 56 - column 11, line 12; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0131339 (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB], et al) [X] 1-41 * page 1, lines 3-5 * * page 4, lines 16-19 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, lines 6-17 * * page 9, lines 5-21; claim - *; | [X]WO0007702 (POLY AN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-41 * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 27 * * page 9, line 18 - page 11, line 9; example -; claim - *; | [X] - PILETSKY S A ET AL, "SURFACE FUNCTIONALIZATION OF POROUS POLYPROPYLENE MEMBRANES WITH MOLECULARLY IMPRINTED POLYMERS BY PHOTOGRAFT COPOLYMERIZATION IN WATER", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (20000418), vol. 33, no. 8, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 3092 - 3098, XP001015564 [X] 1-41 * page 3092, column L, paragraph 2 - page 3094, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 3097, column L, paragraph 4 - page 3098, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma991087f | [X] - ULBRICHT M ET AL, "Novel molecularly imprinted polymer (MIP) composite membranes via controlled surface and pore functionalizations", DESALINATION, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING CO, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020910), vol. 149, no. 1-3, ISSN 0011-9164, pages 293 - 295, XP004386524 [X] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0011-9164(02)00800-7 | [X] - SCHWEITZ L ET AL, "Alternative methods providing enhanced sensitivity and selectivity in capillary electroseparation experiments", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000915), vol. 892, no. 1-2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 203 - 217, XP004212065 [X] 1-41 * page 210, column L, paragraph L - page 212, column R, paragraph 1; figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00239-9 | by applicant | WO0021658 |