EP1568004 - COLOUR CONTROL FOR ACTIVE MATRIX ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TPO Displays Corp. No. 12, Ke Jung Road Science-Based Industrial Park Chu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | [2008/28] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHILDS, Mark, J., Philips IP & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/35] | Williamson, Paul Lewis Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03769798.4 | 11.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003IB05105 | Priority number, date | GB20020027356 | 23.11.2002 Original published format: GB 0227356 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004049289 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568004 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G3/32 (KR);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0606 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0626 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0666 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G3/2014 (EP,US);
G09G3/2074 (EP,US);
G09G3/2081 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBSTEUERUNG FÜR EINE ELEKTROLUMINESZENZ-AKTIVMATRIXANZEIGE | [2005/35] | English: | COLOUR CONTROL FOR ACTIVE MATRIX ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY | [2005/35] | French: | CONTROLE DES COULEURS POUR DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ELECTROLUMINESCENT A MATRICE ACTIVE | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 14.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1061497 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050]; figures 4,6,7 *; | [X]US2002171611 (COK RONALD S [US]) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO9724706 (CREE RESEARCH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 16, line 22 - page 17, line 14; figures 1-3 * * page 32, line 28 - page 34, line 11; figure 12 *; | [Y]EP0762374 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 7 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 29; figure 3 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 34; figures 2,4,5 *; | [A]JP2001290457 | [Y] - YUMOTO A ET AL, "PIXEL-DRIVING METHODS FOR LARGE-SIZED POLY-SI AM-OLED DISPLAYS", ASIA DISPLAY / IDW'01. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 21ST INTERNATIONAL DISPLAY RESEARCH CONFERENCE IN CONJUCTION WITH THE 8TH INTERNATIONAL DISPLAY WORKSHOPS. NAGOYA, JAPAN, OCT. 16 - 19, 2001, INTERNATIONAL DISPLAY RESEARCH CONFERENCE. IDRC, SAN JOSE, CA: SID, (20011016), vol. CONF. 21 / 8, pages 1395 - 1398, XP001134248 [Y] 1-11 * page 1396, column R, line 1 - page 1397, column R, line 17; figures 1-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001290457 A 20011019 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0182]; figures 22-26 * |