EP1565865 - COMPUTER-AIDED DETECTION OF LUNG NODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEMKER, Rafael c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03769820.6 | 12.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003IB05136 | Priority number, date | EP20020079814 | 20.11.2002 Original published format: EP 02079814 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004046995 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1565865 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTER-GESTÜTZTE DETEKTION VON LUNGENKNOTEN | [2005/34] | English: | COMPUTER-AIDED DETECTION OF LUNG NODULES | [2005/34] | French: | DETECTION ASSISTEE PAR ORDINATEUR DE NODULES PULMONAIRES | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 02.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PA]DE10160206 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE]) [PA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US6078680 (YOSHIDA HIROYUKI [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 24 * * column 6, line 28 - column 10, line 58 *; | [A]US5987094 (CLARKE LAURENCE P [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 5, line 28 * | [DA] - SHYH-LIANG LOU ET AL, "Object-based deformation technique for 3D CT lung nodule detection", PROC. SPIE - INT. SOC. OPT. ENG. (USA), PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, 1999, SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG, USA, (199902), vol. 3661, pt.1-2, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 1544 - 1552, XP002279163 [DA] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.348557 | [A] - WIEMKER R ET AL, "Computer-aided lung nodule detection on high-resolution CT data", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (200205), vol. 4684, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 677 - 688, XP002259534 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.467210 | [A] - MARYELLEN LISSAK GIGER ET AL, "COMPUTERIZED DETECTION OF PULMONARY NODULES IN DIGITAL CHEST IMAGES: USE OF MORPHOLOGICAL FILTERS IN REDUCING FALSE-POSITIVE DETECTIONS", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19900901), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 861 - 865, XP000170779 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.596478 | [A] - OKUMURA T ET AL, "Automatic detection of lung cancers in chest CT images by variable N-Quoit filter", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. FOURTEENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BRISBANE, QLD., AUSTRALIA 16-20 AUG. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980816), ISBN 0-8186-8512-3, pages 1671 - 1673, XP010297677 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.1998.712041 | [A] - MITANI Y ET AL, "A Gabor filter-based classification for diffuse lung opacities in thin-section computed tomography images", KNOWLEDGE-BASED INTELLIGENT ENGINEERING SYSTEMS AND ALLIED TECHNOLOGIES, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BRIGHTON, UK 30 AUG.-1 SEPT. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000830), ISBN 0-7803-6400-7, pages 780 - 783, XP010523714 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/KES.2000.884162 | [A] - CHIOU Y S P ET AL, "Neural-knowledge base object detection in Hybrid Lung Nodule Detection (HLND) system", NEURAL NETWORKS, 1994. IEEE WORLD CONGRESS ON COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE., 1994 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 27 JUNE-2 JULY 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940627), ISBN 0-7803-1901-X, pages 4180 - 4185, XP010128047 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICNN.1994.374936 |