EP1580912 - METHOD FOR MULTI-USER DEMODULATION WITH VARIABLE SPREAD SPECTRUM COEFFICIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Academy of Telecommunications Technology No. 40 Xue yuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | [2011/36] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Da Tang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. No. 40 Xue Yuan Rd., Hai Dian District Beijing 100083 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Feng No.40 Xue Yuan Rd. Hai Dian District BeiJing 100083 / CN | [2015/07] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
LI, Feng No.40 Xue Yuan Rd., Hai Dian District BeiJing 100083 / CN | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [2015/07] |
Former [2005/39] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03770867.4 | 13.11.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003CN00960 | Priority number, date | CN2002148623 | 13.11.2002 Original published format: CN 02148623 | [2005/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004045121 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1580912 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1580912 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, // H04B1/707 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
H04B1/7103 (EP,KR,US);
H04B2201/70703 (EP,US);
H04J13/0044 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/39] | H04J13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MEHRBENUTZERDEMODULATION MIT VARIABLEM SPREIZSPEKTRUMKOEFFIZIENTEN | [2005/40] | English: | METHOD FOR MULTI-USER DEMODULATION WITH VARIABLE SPREAD SPECTRUM COEFFICIENT | [2005/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE DEMODULATION MULTI-UTILISATEURS AVEC COEFFICIENT D'ETALEMENT DU SPECTRE VARIABLE | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/39] | VERFAHREN ZUR MEHRBENUTZERDEMODULATION MIT VARIABLEMSPREIZSPEKTRUMKOEFFIZIENTEN | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2005 | Translation filed | 20.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 04.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2014 | 08.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2014 | 16.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2003 | AT | 11.02.2015 | BG | 11.02.2015 | CY | 11.02.2015 | CZ | 11.02.2015 | DK | 11.02.2015 | EE | 11.02.2015 | ES | 11.02.2015 | FI | 11.02.2015 | IT | 11.02.2015 | MC | 11.02.2015 | NL | 11.02.2015 | PT | 11.02.2015 | RO | 11.02.2015 | SE | 11.02.2015 | SI | 11.02.2015 | SK | 11.02.2015 | TR | 11.02.2015 | GR | 12.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.11.2003 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2359966 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 13 - page 5, line 19 *; | [Y]WO0213395 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, line 19 - page 5, line 16; figures 1-3 * * page 46, line 5 - page 48, line 5; figure 21 *; | [A]WO0221729 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract ** page 10, line 24 - page 12, line 21 * | International search | [A]US6192042 (SEO KYUNG SAM [KR]); | [A]WO0122610 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO0150620 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]JP2002290275 (FUJITSU LTD) | Examination | US2002136278 |