20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
18.12.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
18.12.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
03.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
16.01.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
08.01.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.01.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.12.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.10.2014 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
02.06.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
27.05.2014 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
27.05.2014 |
Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
07.05.2014 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
22.04.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.04.2014 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.01.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.03.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.08.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.08.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
01.04.2011 |
First examination report |
|
30.03.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
11.01.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
06.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2005 |
Change - German title |
published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] |
12.08.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] |
12.08.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] |
05.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|