EP1583958 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATING A GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNAIBEL, Eberhard Hochstetterstrasse 1/5 71282 Hemmingen / DE | 02 /
JUNGINGER, Erich Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 50 70191 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
KORING, Andreas Moerikestrasse 25 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 04 /
DEIBERT, Ruediger Brandenburger Str. 8 73730 Esslingen a. N. / DE | 05 /
BRAUN, Harry Wartmauerstrasse 5 71296 Heimsheim / DE | 06 /
DIEHL, Lothar Panoramastrasse 73/2 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2005/41] | Application number, filing date | 03770879.9 | 24.09.2003 | [2005/41] | WO2003DE03168 | Priority number, date | DE2002157284 | 07.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10257284 | [2005/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004053475 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1583958 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583958 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/417 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
G01N27/4175 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2006/13] |
Former [2005/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES GASSENSORS | [2005/41] | English: | CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATING A GAS SENSOR | [2005/41] | French: | CIRCUITERIE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN CAPTEUR DE GAZ | [2005/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE4333231 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * page 1, line 67 - page 3, line 13; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19636226 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6059947 (KATO NOBUHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 52 - column 13, line 5; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6471840 (GAO YUNZHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 65; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US5804700 (KWON CHANG-SOON [KR], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 37; figure 6 * |