EP1550185 - ELECTRIC CONTACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REHBEIN, Peter Mirabellenbaumweg 8 71287 Weissach / DE | 02 /
HAAS, Volker Robert-Bosch-Platz 1 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2005/27] | Application number, filing date | 03770895.5 | 02.10.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003DE03296 | Priority number, date | DE2002146062 | 02.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10246062 | [2005/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004032284 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550185 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/03 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
H01R13/035 (EP,US);
B32B15/01 (EP,US);
B32B15/018 (EP,US);
C22C5/06 (EP,US);
C22C9/00 (EP,US);
C22C9/02 (EP,US);
C22C9/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12896 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/04] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER KONTAKT | [2005/27] | English: | ELECTRIC CONTACT | [2005/27] | French: | CONTACT ELECTRIQUE | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 04.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0428740 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 15 - line 24 * * page 5, line 4 - line 7SERRAN *; | [A]US5800932 (SUZUKI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 36 - line 45 *; | [A]US6183886 (CHEN SZUCHAIN [US], et al) | by applicant | US5800932 |