EP1608866 - FUEL-INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUEGLER, Thomas Siebenmorgenstr. 12 70825 Korntal-Muenchingen / DE | 02 /
MERTENS, Jochen Hofstattstrasse 19 72764 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
ÜSKÜDAR, Hasiman Ihsaniye Mah. Nilüfer Sok. No: 6/6 Nilüfer, Bursa / TR | [2005/52] | Application number, filing date | 03770899.7 | 06.10.2003 | [2005/52] | WO2003DE03304 | Priority number, date | DE2003112586 | 21.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10312586 | [2005/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004085824 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1608866 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1608866 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M45/08 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
F02M61/12 (EP,US);
F02M45/086 (EP,US);
F02M61/18 (EP,US);
F02M2200/46 (EP,US);
F02M61/1806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/26] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 21.10.2005 | LT | 21.10.2005 | LV | 21.10.2005 | MK | 21.10.2005 | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN | [2006/12] | English: | FUEL-INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [2005/52] | French: | SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT DE MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2005/52] |
Former [2005/52] | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL F R BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 15.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0967382 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO02090754 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10122241 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1035322 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |