EP1429464 - HIGH FREQUENCY MODULE AND RADIO DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Matsushita Electronics Corporation 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIHASHI, Yoshikuni 2-26-1-1113, Nishiokamoto, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0073 / JP | 02 /
IWAMIYA, Hiroki 1-9-4-201, Nasuzukuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP | 03 /
OSUMI, Yuji 5-31-202, Kitahonmachi Yamatotakada-shi, Nara 635-0097 / JP | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Holmes, Miles, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets, Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03771286.6 | 23.07.2003 | [2004/25] | WO2003JP09312 | Priority number, date | JP20020222788 | 31.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002222788 | [2004/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004012351 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429464 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429464 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/03, H01P1/20 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
H01P1/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | H04B1/03 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/47] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZMODUL UND FUNKEINRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2004/25] | English: | HIGH FREQUENCY MODULE AND RADIO DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2004/25] | French: | MODULE HAUTE FREQUENCE ET DISPOSITIF RADIO UTILISANT UN TEL MODULE | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2004 | Translation filed | 26.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 23.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH042223 ; | [A]JPS58204627 ; | [A]US4661998 (YAMASHITA SADAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 33; figures 3-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920409), vol. 016, no. 142, Database accession no. (E - 1187), & JP04002223 A 19920107 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840306), vol. 008, no. 049, Database accession no. (E - 230), & JP58204627 A 19831129 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2002043805 (TAMAGAWA ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JPS57200944U ; | [A]JPH10285060 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH09270828 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2001218120 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) |