EP1525673 - SYNCHRONIZATION STRATEGY AND ARCHITECTURE FOR SPREAD-SPECTRUM RECEIVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3, Rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing DTV 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARGETTS, Adam, Robert 632 Ashtabula Ct. Columbus, OH 43210 / US | 02 /
LITWIN, Louis, Robert Jr. 15 Guisborough Way Edison, NJ 08820 Middlesex / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/17] | 01 /
MARGETTS, Adam, Robert 29-02 Fox Run Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | ||
02 /
LITWIN, Louis, Robert 34-14 Quail Ridge Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | Representative(s) | Amor, Rim, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Amor, Rim, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [N/P] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/17] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson, 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03771708.9 | 22.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003US22885 | Priority number, date | US20020207614 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: US 207614 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004012462 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1525673 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525673 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/7073, H04B1/7075, H04B1/7077, H04B1/7093 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
H04B1/7093 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/7073 (KR);
H04B1/70735 (EP,US);
H04B1/7075 (EP,US);
H04B1/70755 (EP,US);
H04B1/70775 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/51] | H04B1/69, H04B1/707 | ||
Former IPC [2005/17] | H04B1/69 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/35] |
Former [2005/46] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISATIONSSTRATEGIE UND ARCHITEKTUR FÜR SPREIZSPEKTRUM-EMPFÄNGER | [2005/17] | English: | SYNCHRONIZATION STRATEGY AND ARCHITECTURE FOR SPREAD-SPECTRUM RECEIVERS | [2005/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET ARCHITECTURE PERMETTANT LA SYNCHRONISATION DE RECEPTEURS A SPECTRE ETALE | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 18.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.08.2018 | [2019/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0101596 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 9, line 28 - page 11, line 2; figure 3 *; | [XY]EP1093237 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 10-13,19-21 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; figure 4 * [Y] 1-9,14-18,22,23; | [A]WO0154287 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-23* page 12, line 14 - page 13, line 12; figures 1,5B *; | [Y]WO0213548 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [Y] 1-9,14-18,22,23 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028]; figure 4 * | International search | [A]US6204812 (FATTOUCHE MICHEL [CA]); | [X]US6259724 (ESMAILZADEH RIAZ [SE]) |