EP1525251 - VERSATILE PROCESSES FOR PREPARING AND USING NOVEL COMPOSITE PARTICLES IN POWDER COATING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWIMC LLC 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | For all designated states The Sherwin-Williams Headquarters Company 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | ||
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states The Sherwin-Williams Company 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | ||
Former [2018/39] | For all designated states The Valspar Corporation 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | ||
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Engineered Polymer Solutions, Inc. 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | ||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Valspar Sourcing, Inc. 901 3rd Ave. South P.O. Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1461 / US | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Valspar Sourcing, Inc. 1101 Third Street South Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US | ||
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states H.B. Fuller Company 1200 Willow Lake Boulevard Box 64683 St.Paul, MN 55164-0683 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLATTER, Walter, J. 1095 Scarborough Lane Woodbury, MN 55125 / US | 02 /
HECK, James, A. 22432 Iverson Lane North Forest Lake, MN 55025 / US | 03 /
LINDQUIST, Lowell, G. 851 Lincolntown Avenue Mahtomedi, MN 55115 / US | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2018/17] |
Former [2005/17] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03771779.0 | 24.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003US23123 | Priority number, date | US20020206482 | 26.07.2002 Original published format: US 206482 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004011531 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525251 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525251 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/20, C09D5/03, C08J7/04 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
C09D5/03 (EP,US);
B29B9/12 (EP);
B29B9/16 (EP,US);
C08J3/203 (EP,US);
B29B2009/125 (EP,US);
B29B2009/163 (EP,US);
B29B2009/166 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/17] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VIELSEITIGE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG NEUER VERBUNDTEILCHEN IN PULVERBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2005/17] | English: | VERSATILE PROCESSES FOR PREPARING AND USING NOVEL COMPOSITE PARTICLES IN POWDER COATING COMPOSITIONS | [2005/17] | French: | PROCEDES POLYVALENTS DE PREPARATION ET D'UTILISATION DE NOUVELLES PARTICULES COMPOSITES DANS DES COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENT EN POUDRE | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 15.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10180342.7 / EP2267063 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.07.2003 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | IE | 24.07.2018 | LU | 24.07.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 24.07.2003 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 24.07.2018 | ||
LU | 24.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 24.07.2018 | ||
LU | 24.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 24.07.2018 | ||
LU | 24.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 24.07.2018 | ||
LU | 24.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 24.07.2018 | ||
LU | 24.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 24.07.2018 | ||
LU | 24.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 24.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4243794 (WHITE JAMES L, et al) [X] 2-15 * column 1, lines 15-30 * * column 2, line 20 - column 7, line 5; claim - *; | [X]WO9118951 (COURTAULDS COATINGS HOLDINGS [GB]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 3-9 * * page 6, line 17 - page 8, line 12 * * page 10, line 14 - page 13, line 26 * * page 30, line 16 - page 34, line 9 * * page 44, line 22 - page 56, line 25 * * page 59, lines 8-16; claim - *; | [X]WO9808614 (BERNECKI THOMAS F [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 1-8 * * page 2, lines 1-23 * * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 15 * * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 5 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US6197369 (WATANO SATORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,12,14* column 2, line 5 - column 5, line 10; figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO0185360 (UNIV BELFAST [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 29 * * page 6, line 24 - page 10, line 18; figure .; claim - * | Examination | GB1331310 | GB1434085 | EP0471463 | US5300539 | EP1323769 |