EP1532619 - RECEIVING AND REPORTING PAGE-SPECIFIC USER FEEDBACK CONCERNING ONE OR MORE PARTICULAR WEB PAGES OF A WEBSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Opinionlab, Inc. Suite 300, 513 Central Avenue Highland Park, IL 60035 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Opinionlab, Inc. Suite 300, 513 Central Avenue Highland Park, IL 60035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICKERSON, Rand, B. 2684 Sheridan Road Highland Park, IL 60035 / US | 02 /
TRESCHL, Mark, A. 1283 Sherwood Road Highland Park, IL 60035 / US | 03 /
RUDMAN, Jay, S. 2024 N. Racine, Unit M Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 04 /
KREBS, Mark, D. 2738 Birchwood Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Carrie-Anne Louise, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03771825.1 | 25.07.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003US23250 | Priority number, date | US20020210256 | 31.07.2002 Original published format: US 210256 | US20020238191 | 09.09.2002 Original published format: US 238191 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004012044 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1532619 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP);
G06F16/958 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFANGEN UND MELDEN VON SEITENSPEZIFISCHEN BENUTZERR CKMELDUNGEN BEZ GLICH EINER ODER MEHRERER BESTIMMTER WEBSEITEN EINER WEBSITE | [2005/21] | English: | RECEIVING AND REPORTING PAGE-SPECIFIC USER FEEDBACK CONCERNING ONE OR MORE PARTICULAR WEB PAGES OF A WEBSITE | [2005/21] | French: | RECEPTION ET TRANSMISSION D'UNE REACTION D'UTILISATEUR SPECIFIQUE CONCERNANT UNE OU PLUSIEURS PAGES WEB PARTICULIERES D'UN SITE WEB | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2015 | Observations by third parties | 13.07.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2016 | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/49] | 28.07.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 17.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9959096 (CUSTOMER CAST INC [US]) [Y] 1-23 * abstract *; | [X] - JEFFREY GRAHAM, Alternatives to Testing User Experience, CLICKZ.COM, (20000731), XP002382095 [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0005] * | [X] - The OnlineOpinion System - Different From Other Feedback Techniques, OPINIONLAB, (20020723), XP002382096 [X] 1-23 * the whole document * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, OpinionLab, DIARIST.NET, (20010508), XP002382097 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6243722 ; | [Y]US6161112 | Examination | - MCDONALD M J ET AL, "MULTIMEDIA FEEDBACK SYSTEMS FOR ENGINEERING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANS TOPICAL MEETING ON ROBOTICS AND REMOTE SYSTEMS, XX, XX, (19990425), no. ED. 8, pages 1 - 7, XP003035563 |