EP1551877 - TACI ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco California 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNTHARAPAI, Anan 826 Ellis Drive Colma, CA 94015 / US | 02 /
GREWAL, Iqbal 34802 Candice Court Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 03 /
KIM, Kyung Jin 22830 San Juan Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
YAN, Minhong 1910 Garden Drive, 114 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03771900.2 | 25.07.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US23421 | Priority number, date | US20020398530P | 25.07.2002 Original published format: US 398530 P | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004011611 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1551877 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/44, C07K16/46, A61K39/395, A61K51/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TACI-ANTIKÖRPER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2005/28] | English: | TACI ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2005/28] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-TACI ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI | [2005/28] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/39] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.2007 | Decision despatched | 12.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5969102 (BRAM RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,18,19,24,4,6,7,41,42 * sequences 2,6 * * column 6, line 29 - line 33 * * column 43, line 45 - line 56 * * column 35, line 14 - line 16 * * column 16, line 13 - line 23 * * column 35, line 35 - line 40 * * column 35, line 50 - line 63 *; | [XY]WO0160397 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3,22-24,39 * sequence 2 * * page 7, line 20 - line 21 * * page 40, line 28 - line 29 * * claims 1,14 * * page 37, line 36 - line 39 * * page 65, line 36 - line 37 * * page 39, line 1 - line 10 * * page 41, line 28 - page 42, line 17 * * claim 9 * [Y] 17,20,21,34-38; | [Y]US2002004587 (MILLER KATHY L [US], et al) [Y] 17,20,21,34-38 * paragraph [0305] * * paragraph [0271] * * paragraph [0064] ** paragraph [0358] - paragraph [0360] * | International search | [Y]WO0160397 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [Y]US2002004587 (MILLER KATHY L [US], et al) |