EP1556385 - HETEROCYCLOCARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property Department Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property Department, Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property Department, Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHRENFREUND, Josef Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 02 /
TOBLER, Hans Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 03 /
WALTER, Harald Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Hölscher, Ingo, et al Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Hölscher, Ingo, et al Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2006/24] | Ward, Steven Paul, et al Syngenta Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Jealott's Hill International Research Centre, P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell RG42 6YA / GB | ||
Former [2005/30] | Bastian, Werner Maria Syngenta Participations AG, Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 03772217.0 | 14.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003EP11388 | Priority number, date | GB20020024316 | 18.10.2002 Original published format: GB 0224316 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004035589 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1556385 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1556385 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/08, C07D493/08, C07D495/08, C07D207/34, C07D231/14, C07D213/78, C07D277/56, C07D263/34, C07D327/06, A01N43/36, A01N43/32, A01N43/50 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/32 (EP,US);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07C211/61 (EP,US);
C07D207/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/78 (KR);
C07D231/14 (EP,US);
C07D263/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07D277/56 (EP,US);
C07D327/06 (EP,US);
C07D493/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | 15.03.2005 | LT | 15.03.2005 | LV | 15.03.2005 | MK | 15.03.2005 | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLOCARBOXAMIDDERIVATE | [2005/30] | English: | HETEROCYCLOCARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES | [2005/30] | French: | DERIVES D'HETEROCYCLOCARBOXAMIDE | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 02.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0009482 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-10 * examples 66-69 *; | [Y]WO0149664 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-10 * table 9 *; | [Y]WO0153259 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-10 * table 9 *; | [A]WO02066470 (AMGEN INC) [A] 1-10 * examples 87,333,306,362,646 *; | [DA] - A.J.KIRBY ET AL., CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS, no. 2, pages 1081 - 1093, XP009026772 [DA] 7,8 * example 30 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a700155j | [AD] - ODA, MASATSUGU ET.AL., "structure activity relationships of 2-Chloropyridine-3-carboxamide fungicides", JOURNAL OF PESTICIDE SCIENCE (INT.ED.), no. 18, pages 49 - 57, XP009026800 [AD] 1-10 * examples 36,37 * | [DA] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 7269102 (BRN), XP002271778 [DA] 7,8 * abstract * | [DA] - PLIENINGER, H. ET AL., CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, no. 109, pages 2126 - 2139 [DA] 7,8 * example - * | [A] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 4803445 (BRN), XP002271779 [A] 7,8 * abstract * | [DA] - GRAVEL, D. ET AL., CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, vol. 69, no. 8, pages 1193 - 1200 [DA] 7,8 * example - * | [AD] - ROBERT A. SNOW ET AL, "Analysis of bridging regioselectivity operative in photorearrangement of ortho-substituted benzonorbornadienes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEM. SOCIETY, vol. 99, no. 11, pages 3734 - 3744, XP002271785 [AD] 7,8 * example 23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00453a036 | [DA] - H.PLIENINGER ET AL, "Synthese von benz[c,d]indol-derivaten", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, vol. 109, pages 2121 - 2125, XP009026773 [DA] 7,8 * examples 9,10 * |