EP1613176 - METHOD OF IMPROVING THE HYDRATION OF PASTA AND PREPARATION OF PASTA PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 Postboks 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | [2012/32] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Dupont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states DANISCO A/S Langebrogade 1, P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOEGH, Lars, Danisco A/S Edwin Rahrs, Vej 38 DK-8220 Braband / DK | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Williams, Aylsa, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Williams, Aylsa, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03772593.4 | 04.11.2003 | [2006/02] | WO2003IB05514 | Priority number, date | US20030463204P | 16.04.2003 Original published format: US 463204 P | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004091312 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1613176 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613176 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/16 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
C12Y101/03004 (EP,US);
A23L29/06 (EP,US);
A23L5/55 (EP,US);
A23L7/107 (EP,US);
A23L7/109 (EP,US);
A23L7/11 (EP,US);
A23L7/111 (EP,US);
C12Y101/03005 (EP,US);
C12Y101/03009 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Extension states | AL | 02.11.2005 | LT | 02.11.2005 | LV | 02.11.2005 | MK | 02.11.2005 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBESSERN DER HYDRATION VON TEIGWAREN UND ZUR BEREITUNG DER TEIGENWARENPRODUKTE | [2006/02] | English: | METHOD OF IMPROVING THE HYDRATION OF PASTA AND PREPARATION OF PASTA PRODUCTS | [2006/02] | French: | PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER L'HYDRATATION DES PATES ALIMENTAIRES ET PREPARATION DE PRODUITS A BASE DE CELLES-CI | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 13.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2007
15.01.2008
ADMISSIBLE NOVOZYMES A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2007
15.01.2008
ADMISSIBLE NOVOZYMES A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2007
15.01.2008
ADMISSIBLE NOVOZYMES A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Stevens, Ian Edward Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2007
NOVOZYMES A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Stevens, Ian Edward Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk GB-Nottigham NG1 5DD / GB | 22.01.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.05.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.05.2008 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2008 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.12.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 05.12.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/49] | 23.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 01.04.2011 | Appeal received No. T0719/11 | 01.06.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.12.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 28.03.2011 | Appeal received No. T0719/11 | 01.06.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.12.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 05.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.03.2007 | CY | 07.03.2007 | EE | 07.03.2007 | LI | 07.03.2007 | RO | 07.03.2007 | SI | 07.03.2007 | BG | 07.06.2007 | HU | 08.09.2007 | LU | 04.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2015/08] |
Former [2009/43] | CY | 07.03.2007 | |
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
BG | 07.06.2007 | ||
HU | 08.09.2007 | ||
LU | 04.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CY | 07.03.2007 | |
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
BG | 07.06.2007 | ||
LU | 04.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 07.03.2007 | |
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | EE | 07.03.2007 | |
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | RO | 07.03.2007 | |
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | RO | 07.03.2007 | |
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 07.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3520702 (MENZI ROBERT) [A] 1-35 * column 1, line 24 - line 35 * * column 2, line 10 - line 17; claim 1 *; | [A]US4540590 (HARADA HARUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-35 * column 1, line 5 - line 42 *; | [A]US2003003190 (BROWN PETER HARRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * column 1, line 32 - line 36 ** column 2, line 26 - line 29; figure 1 * |