EP1561421 - LANCET AND NEEDLE INSERTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishi Aketa-Cho, Higashi-kujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKATA, Tetsuya, c/o ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/31] | Vocke, Henrik, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03772723.7 | 12.11.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003JP14398 | Priority number, date | JP20020331603 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002331603 | [2005/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004045409 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561421 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/150603 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150435 (EP,US);
A61B5/150572 (EP,US);
A61B5/150587 (EP,US);
A61B5/150633 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANZETTE UND NADELEINFÜHRVORRICHTUNG | [2005/32] | English: | LANCET AND NEEDLE INSERTION DEVICE | [2005/32] | French: | LANCETTE ET DISPOSITIF D'INSERTION D'AIGUILLE | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2005 | Translation filed | 20.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002052618 (HAAR HANS-PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0121] - [0124]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2002087180 (SEARLE STEPHEN D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0025] - [0029]; figures 7-9 * | International search | [X]JPH0588503U ; | [A]JPH07222735 (BAYER AG); | [X]WO9704707 (APLS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JPH0119577 ; | [A]JPH08597 (MISAWA MEDICAL IND) | by applicant | US2002087180 |