EP1582092 - APPARATUS FOR INDUCTIVE AND RESISTIVE HEATING OF AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems Ltd. 500 Queen Street South Bolton, ON L7E 5S5 / CA | [2010/22] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems S.A. Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEMS LTD. 530 Queen Street South Bolton Ontario L7E 5S5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PILAVDZIC, Jim 11 Country Lane Milton, VT 05468 / US | 02 /
VON BUREN, Stefan 59 Overlake Drive Colchester, VT 05446 / US | 03 /
KAGAN, Valery 46 Laura Lane Colchester, VT 05446 / US | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwaltskanzlei Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/45] | Cramphorn, Conrad Dr. Volker Vossius Patent-und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/14] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Husky Injection Molding Systems SA Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | ||
Former [2007/02] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Dearling, Bruce Clive Husky Injection Molding Systems SA Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 L-3401 Dudelange / LU | Application number, filing date | 03773383.9 | 05.11.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003CA01707 | Priority number, date | US20020327442 | 21.12.2002 Original published format: US 327442 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004057918 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582092 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582092 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/10, H05B6/14 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
B29C45/74 (EP,US);
B29C48/832 (EP,US);
B29C48/865 (EP,US);
H05B6/108 (EP,US);
H05B6/14 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0811 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | 21.07.2005 | LT | 21.07.2005 | LV | 21.07.2005 | MK | 21.07.2005 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM INDUKTIVEN UND RESISTIVEN ERWÄRMEN EINES OBJEKTS | [2005/40] | English: | APPARATUS FOR INDUCTIVE AND RESISTIVE HEATING OF AN OBJECT | [2005/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE INDUCTIF ET OHMIQUE D'UN OBJET | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2009 | 14.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2010 | BE | 23.06.2010 | CY | 23.06.2010 | CZ | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | EE | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | IT | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | RO | 23.06.2010 | SE | 23.06.2010 | SI | 23.06.2010 | SK | 23.06.2010 | TR | 23.06.2010 | BG | 23.09.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | ES | 04.10.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | GB | 05.11.2010 | IE | 05.11.2010 | LU | 05.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | FR | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | HU | 24.12.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 05.11.2010 | ||
IE | 05.11.2010 | ||
LU | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 05.11.2010 | ||
IE | 05.11.2010 | ||
LU | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 05.11.2010 | ||
IE | 05.11.2010 | ||
LU | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 05.11.2010 | ||
IE | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 05.11.2010 | ||
IE | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 05.11.2010 | ||
IE | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
IE | 05.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
SE | 23.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3307009 (SCHROEDER CHARLES F) [X] 1,3,4,8,24 * column 1, lines 13-17 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 25 * * column 5, lines 27-39 * * figure 3 * [Y] 2,6,7; | [A]US4726751 (SHIBATA ITSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 4 ** column 12, lines 33-37 *; | [Y]US6405785 (GELLERT JOBST U [CA], et al) [Y] 2,6,7 * figures 4,5,14 * * column 5, lines 39-49 * |