EP1558774 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT A TRIBOCHEMICAL REACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plath, Peter Jörg Vogelgesangstrasse 26 17279 Lychen / DE | For all designated states Swart, Elisabeth Vogelgesangstrasse 26 17279 Lychen / DE | [2008/03] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Plath, Peter Jörg Tegelhoff 10 27229 Langewedel-Daverden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Bittner, Thomas L., Dr. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03773570.1 | 22.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003DE03525 | Priority number, date | DE2002149163 | 22.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10249163 | [2005/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004038048 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1558774 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558774 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22B34/12, C22B1/00 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C22B34/129 (EP);
C22B1/00 (EP);
C22B34/1204 (EP);
C22B34/1209 (EP);
C22B34/1222 (EP);
C22B34/1281 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHFÜHREN EINER TRIBOCHEMISCEN REAKTION | [2005/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT A TRIBOCHEMICAL REACTION | [2005/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR EFFECTUER UNE REACTION TRIBOCHIMIQUE | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.02.2008 | CZ | 06.02.2008 | DK | 06.02.2008 | EE | 06.02.2008 | FI | 06.02.2008 | IE | 06.02.2008 | IT | 06.02.2008 | NL | 06.02.2008 | RO | 06.02.2008 | SI | 06.02.2008 | SK | 06.02.2008 | TR | 06.02.2008 | BG | 06.05.2008 | SE | 06.05.2008 | GR | 07.05.2008 | ES | 17.05.2008 | PT | 07.07.2008 | HU | 07.08.2008 | AT | 22.10.2008 | LU | 22.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
IT | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
TR | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
HU | 07.08.2008 | ||
AT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 22.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
IT | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
HU | 07.08.2008 | ||
AT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 22.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
IT | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
AT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 22.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
IT | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
AT | 22.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
IT | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
IT | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 06.02.2008 | |
CZ | 06.02.2008 | ||
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
BG | 06.05.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
EE | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 06.02.2008 | |
DK | 06.02.2008 | ||
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
RO | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SK | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
PT | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 06.02.2008 | |
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
NL | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 06.02.2008 | |
FI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
SE | 06.05.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 06.02.2008 | |
SI | 06.02.2008 | ||
ES | 17.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 06.02.2008 | |
ES | 17.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9508004 (UNIV AUSTRALIAN [AU], et al) [X] 1,8 * Anspruch 1 *; | [X]EP0744234 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [X] 1,5-7 * Spalte 3, Zeilen 37-46; Beispiel 4; Anspruch 1 *; | [X]US5582629 (NAKAI SADAO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * Spalte 4, Zeilen 44-62 *; | [APD]WO02083261 (MIR CHEM GMBH [DE], et al); | [X] - POPOVICH A A ET AL, "Mechanisms governing tribochemical reduction of metals and non-metals from their oxides", J ALLOYS COMPD;JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS JAN 11 1993, (19930111), vol. 190, no. 2, pages 143 - 147, XP002270629 [X] 1-4,9 * Seite 144 "Experimental procedures" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-8388(93)90390-9 | [X] - POPOVICH A A, "Microstructure and properties of titanium carbide and titanium carbide-based alloys obtained by tribochemical synthesis", J ALLOYS COMPD;JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS MAY 24 1993, (19930524), vol. 196, no. 1-2, pages 97 - 104, XP002270630 [X] 1-4,9 * Seite 98 "Experimental procedure" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-8388(93)90577-A | [X] - GERASIMOV K B ET AL, "TRIBOCHEMICAL EQUILIBRIUM IN MECHANICAL ALLOYING OF METALS", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, CHAPMAN AND HALL LTD. LONDON, GB, (19910501), vol. 26, no. 9, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 2495 - 2500, XP000430909 [X] 1 * Seite 2496 "Experimental details" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01130201 | Examination | - MELO F.; UMBANHOWAR P.B.; SWINNEY H.L., "Hexagons, Kinks, and Disorder in Oscillated Granular Layers", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (19951120), vol. 75, no. 21, pages 3838 - 3842 |