EP1575433 - PLATE FIXING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Spine 23, Parvis des Chartrons La Cité Mondiale 33000 Bordeaux / FR | [2008/45] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Abbott Spine 23, Parvis des Chartrons La Cité Mondiale 33000 Bordeaux / FR | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Spine Next 23, Parvis des Chartrons La Cité Mondiale 33000 Bordeaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACCELLI, Christian 35 Avenue du Général de Gaulle F-33640 AYGUEMORTE LES GRAVES / FR | 02 /
MANGIONE, Paolo 73 Rue Xavier Arnozan F-33600 PESSAC / FR | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Balesta, Pierre, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Balesta, Pierre, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2005/38] | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03773815.0 | 02.10.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003FR02890 | Priority number, date | FR20020012397 | 07.10.2002 Original published format: FR 0212397 | FR20030002503 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: FR 0302503 | [2005/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004032772 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1575433 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575433 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B17/70 (KR);
A61B17/58 (KR);
A61B17/701 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FIXIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR KNOCHENPLATTE | [2005/38] | English: | PLATE FIXING SYSTEM | [2005/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE FIXATION A PLAQUE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 21.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2008 | CY | 05.11.2008 | FI | 05.11.2008 | RO | 05.11.2008 | TR | 05.11.2008 | BG | 05.02.2009 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
CY | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 05.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9737620 (SCIENT X SARL [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2812535 (GRAF HENRY [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO02054966 (DEPUY ACROMED INC [US]) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract *; | [PA]FR2827757 (SRA [FR]) [PA] 1,2,6* page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 33; figure - * |